All academies within the Trust are governed by the L.E.A.D. Academy Trust Board and Members. The L.E.A.D. Academy Trust governance structure establishes clear lines of accountability, overview and scrutiny at three levels: The L.E.A.D. Academy Trust Members; the L.E.A.D. Academy Trust Board and its Committees; and the Academy Governing Body (AGB).
The AGB meets formally three times each year (termly) and also meets informally each term through engagement meetings. The Trusts scheme of delegation, AGB terms of reference and articles of association can be accessed by the clicking the links below. These key documents set out the function and role of the AGB.
L.E.A.D. Academy Trust – Governance
Please find below details about this academy’s AGB membership, including the names and terms of appointment for each member.
For any further information please contact the school office.
Name | Governor Category | How Appointed | Date of Appointed | Term of Office | AGB Attendance: Academic Year 2022-2023 |
Melany Pemberton | Executive Headteacher | N/A | N/A | N/A | 3/3 |
Cathy Gibson | Head of School | N/A | 1 September 2022 | N/A | 3/3 |
Paula Snelling | Staff Governor (Support) | Elected by Staff | 18 November 2020 | Resigned 16 November 2023 | 0/3 |
Jane Thomas | Staff Governor (Teaching) | Elected by Staff | 12 November 2019: Re-elected 08 January 2023 | First and Second term: 4 Years | 1/3 |
Caron Britton | Parent Governor | Elected by Parents | 5 March 2020, term expired 5 March 2024 | 4 Years | 2/3 |
Hannah Ireland | Parent Governor | Elected by Parents | 4 January 2021 | 4 Years | 2/3 |
Amber Ludlam | Parent Governor | Elected by Parents | 9 March 2023 | 1 Year and 1 term | 0/1 |
Sharon Damms | Community Governor | Appointed by Trust | 12 November 2019, reappointed for second term from 12 November 2023 | 4 Years | 3/3 |
Chris Jeavons | Community Governor | Appointed by Trust | 8 September 2020, reappointed for second term from 8 September 2024 | 4 Years | 3/3 |
Jessica Abbott | Co-Opted Governor | Appointed by Trust | 5 July 2022 | 4 years | 2/3 |
Ed Wydenbach | Co-Opted Governor | Appointed by Trust | First appointed 1 April 2017, last reappointed from 1 August 2023, then again 1 August 2024 | 1 Year (rolling term) | 3/3 |
Governor Declarations of Interest
Our Chair of Governors, Ed Wydenbach, can be contacted via the school office at [email protected]
Safeguarding Link Governor: Ed Wydenbach